There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mental Health Access and Gun Violence Prevention Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize funding to increase access to mental health care treatment to reduce gun violence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
05/01/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/19/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/07/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/06/2017 Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017 Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017 Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017 Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/10/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary04/06/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations05/01/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/06/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health04/19/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 11/19/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1982 - Mental Health Access and Gun Violence Prevention Act of 2017.

Subjects (12)

  • Criminal justice information and records
  • Department of Health and Human Services
  • Department of Justice
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Firearms and explosives
  • Health care coverage and access
  • Health information and medical records
  • Health programs administration and funding
  • Law enforcement administration and funding
  • Mental health
  • Social Security Administration

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1982. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2017)

Mental Health Access and Gun Violence Prevention Act of 2017

This bill authorizes FY2018 appropriations for the Department of Justice, the Department of Health and Human Services, and the Social Security Administration to: (1) increase access to mental health care treatment and services, and (2) promote reporting of mental health information to the National Instant Criminal Background Check System.