There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Oversight Commission on Presidential Capacity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Oversight Commission on Presidential Capacity, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/01/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/06/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/17/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/29/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/11/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/11/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/11/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/11/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/27/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/18/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/06/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/12/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/12/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/31/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/31/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/31/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/07/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/07/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/16/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/30/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/30/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/30/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/01/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 12/01/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/05/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/05/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 12/06/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 12/06/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/07/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 12/07/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/11/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/12/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/13/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 12/19/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/10/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/10/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/10/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 01/10/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/12/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/12/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/12/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/25/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 04/23/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/06/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice05/01/2017 Referred to
House Rules04/06/2017 Referred to

As of 06/23/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1987 - Oversight Commission on Presidential Capacity Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1987. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2017)

Oversight Commission on Presidential Capacity Act

This bill establishes in the legislative branch an Oversight Commission on Presidential Capacity to determine whether the President is mentally or physically unable to discharge the powers and duties of office.

The commission: (1) within 72 hours after Congress adopts a concurrent resolution directing it to do so, shall conduct a medical examination to determine if the President is temporarily or permanently impaired by physical illness or disability, mental illness, mental deficiency, or alcohol or drug use to the extent that he or she lacks sufficient understanding or capacity to execute the powers and duties of the office of President; and (2) within 72 hours after completing the examination, shall report its findings and conclusions to the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate.

Any refusal by the President to undergo such examination shall be taken into consideration by the commission in reaching a conclusion.