Text: H.R.1995 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2017)


115th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1995


To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for national testing of a model of Medicare Advantage value-based insurance design to meet the needs of chronically ill Medicare Advantage enrollees.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

April 6, 2017

Mrs. Black (for herself, Mr. Blumenauer, Mrs. McMorris Rodgers, and Mrs. Dingell) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for national testing of a model of Medicare Advantage value-based insurance design to meet the needs of chronically ill Medicare Advantage enrollees.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Value-Based Insurance Design for Better Care Act of 2017” or the “V-BID for Better Care Act of 2017”.

SEC. 2. Adapting benefits to meet the needs of chronically ill Medicare Advantage enrollees.

Section 1859 of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395w–28) is amended by adding at the end the following new subsection:

“(h) National testing of model for Medicare Advantage value-Based insurance design.—

“(1) IN GENERAL.—In implementing the model described in paragraph (2) proposed to be tested under section 1115A(b), the Secretary shall revise the testing of the model under such section to cover, effective not later than January 1, 2019, all States.

“(2) MODEL DESCRIBED.—The model described in this paragraph is the testing of a model of Medicare Advantage value-based insurance design that would allow Medicare Advantage plans the option to propose and design benefit structures that vary benefits, cost-sharing, and supplemental benefits offered to enrollees with specific chronic diseases proposed to be carried out in Oregon, Arizona, Texas, Iowa, Michigan, Indiana, Tennessee, Alabama, Pennsylvania, and Massachusetts.

“(3) TERMINATION AND MODIFICATION PROVISION NOT APPLICABLE UNTIL JANUARY 1, 2022.—The provisions of section 1115A(b)(3)(B) shall apply to the model described in paragraph (2), including such model as expanded under paragraph (1), beginning January 1, 2022, but shall not apply to such model, as so expanded, prior to such date.

“(4) FUNDING.—The Secretary shall allocate funds made available under section 1115A(f)(1) to design, implement, and evaluate the model described in paragraph (2), as expanded under paragraph (1).”.


Share This