There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Strengthen Employment And Seasonal Opportunities Now (SEASON) Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modify the provisions of the Immigration and Nationality Act relating to nonimmigrant visas issued under section 101(a)(15)(H)(ii)(b) of such Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/01/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/14/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/14/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/14/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/14/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/14/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/20/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 04/20/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/20/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 04/20/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/25/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/26/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 04/26/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 04/26/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 05/01/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/01/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/01/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/02/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/17/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/17/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 05/18/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 05/30/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/07/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/06/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 10/05/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/03/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/15/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/28/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/05/2018
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/08/2018
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/09/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 01/11/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 01/18/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 02/05/2018
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 02/05/2018
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/13/2018
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/13/2018
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/26/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/05/2018
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 03/09/2018
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/13/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/20/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/16/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/16/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/23/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/06/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security05/01/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/06/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2004.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2004. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2017)

Strengthen Employment And Seasonal Opportunities Now (SEASON) Act

This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide, effective as if enacted on January 1, 2017, that a returning H-2B visa alien (temporary nonagricultural worker) who has already been counted toward the applicable numerical limitation during a fiscal year: (1) shall not again be counted toward such limitation during each succeeding consecutive fiscal year in which the alien is issued an H-2B visa or otherwise provided such status, but (2) shall be considered a returning worker.

"Other temporary service or labor" for H-2B purposes means that an employer's need for labor will not exceed 1 year and is a seasonal (not to exceed 10 months), peak load, or intermittent need, unless it is a one-time occurrence not exceeding 3 years.

An H-2B employer shall file an employee petition with the Department of Homeland Security. Additional filings with the Department of Labor are not required.

H-2B employer requirements are set forth regarding: (1) petitions, (2) admissions and maximum stay in status, (3) housing, (4) enforcement, (5) transportation, (6) recruitment, (7) U.S. worker protections, and (8) wages.

An H-2B worker shall not be entitled to: (1) tax credit assistance for a qualified health plan, and shall be subject to plan rules applicable to individuals not lawfully present in the United States; (2) the child tax credit; and (3) the earned income tax credit.