There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Procurement Efficiency and Transparency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the procurement practices of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/24/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6174-6175)
07/24/2017Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-246.
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
07/25/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/24/2017-7:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2017-7:16pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6174-6175)
07/24/2017-7:16pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6199)
07/24/2017-3:53pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Walz objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
07/24/2017-3:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2006.
07/24/2017-3:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6174-6175)
07/24/2017-3:53pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/24/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 178.
07/24/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-246.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/19/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/19/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/12/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
07/12/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
06/29/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
04/06/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/06/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/06/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Markup by
07/24/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-246
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations04/06/2017 Referred to
06/29/2017 Hearings by
07/12/2017 Markup by
07/12/2017 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/25/2017 Referred to

As of 07/19/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2006 - VA Procurement Efficiency and Transparency Act.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2006. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/24/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

VA Procurement Efficiency and Transparency Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), with respect to any VA contract that is reported in the Federal Procurement Data System, to record the amount of any cost or price savings realized by using competitive procedures in awarding such contract.

(Sec. 3) The VA shall make available and use on a VA-wide basis the standardized procurement templates used by the Central Office of the VA, the Veterans Health Administration, the Veterans Benefits Administration, and the National Cemetery Administration. Such templates may be customized to address particular procurement situations.