There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Kids First Research Act 2.0

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase funding for the 10-Year Pediatric Research Initiative Fund by eliminating taxpayer financing of presidential election campaigns.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/07/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 04/24/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/28/2018
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 09/07/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/07/2017 Referred to
House Administration04/06/2017 Referred to

As of 10/22/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2008 - Kids First Research Act 2.0.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2008. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2017)

Kids First Research Act 2.0

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to terminate: (1) the taxpayer election to designate $3 of income tax liability for financing of presidential election campaigns for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016, (2) the Presidential Election Campaign Fund, and (3) the Presidential Primary Matching Payment Account.

The Department of the Treasury must transfer amounts in the fund as of the date of the enactment of this bill to the 10-Year Pediatric Research Initiative Fund.

The bill expresses the sense of Congress that the Director of the National Institutes of Health (NIH) should oversee and coordinate research that is conducted or supported by the NIH for research on pediatric cancer and other pediatric diseases and conditions, including through the 10-Year Pediatric Research Initiative Fund.

The bill also amends the Public Health Service Act to require the NIH to prioritize pediatric research that does not replicate existing NIH research activities.