There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CO2 Regulatory Certainty Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to enhance the requirements for secure geological storage of carbon dioxide for purposes of the carbon dioxide sequestration credit.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/06/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/25/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/25/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 10/11/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/06/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2010. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2017)

CO2 Regulatory Certainty Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to revise requirements for the secure geological storage of carbon dioxide for the purpose of the tax credit for carbon dioxide sequestration.

The bill establishes a December 31, 2017, deadline and requirements for regulations that the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) is required, under current law, to establish for determining adequate security measures for the geological storage of the carbon dioxide such that carbon dioxide does not escape into the atmosphere.

The IRS regulations must consider the carbon dioxide to be disposed of in secure geological storage if it is stored in compliance with specified rules promulgated by the Environmental Protection Agency under the Clean Air Act and the Safe Drinking Water Act for the geologic sequestration of carbon dioxide, the injection of carbon dioxide, and the criteria and standards for underground injection control programs that are applicable to Class II wells.