There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Equitable Student Aid Access Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to simplify the financial aid application process, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/06/2017Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (100)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/06/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 04/06/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/06/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 04/28/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/28/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/28/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/28/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/28/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/28/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/19/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/20/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/20/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/28/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/28/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/08/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/08/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/08/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/08/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/08/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/08/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 11/28/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 11/28/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/28/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 11/28/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/28/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 11/28/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/28/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/11/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/11/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/15/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/15/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/11/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/11/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/11/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/11/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/26/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/26/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/28/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 10/19/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/19/2018
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/06/2017 04/27/2017 H2920

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce04/06/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2015.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2015. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2017)

Equitable Student Aid Access Act

This bill amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to revise requirements governing the Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA).

The bill increases the adjusted gross income threshold used to determine whether a student qualifies for an automatic zero expected family contribution (EFC) in the calculation of the student's financial need. A dependent student is eligible for an automatic zero EFC if the student's parents have adjusted gross income up to $30,000. An independent student with non-spouse dependents is eligible for a zero EFC if the student and spouse have adjusted gross income up to $30,000.

The bill requires the Department of Education (ED) to allow students to use tax information from the year before the previous one in determining their financial aid eligibility. The Internal Revenue Service and ED must share available data pursuant to taxpayer consent.

The bill requires the FAFSA application to be available to students by October 1, which is three months earlier than is currently required.