There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Radiation Exposure Compensation Act Amendments of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Radiation Exposure Compensation Act to improve compensation for workers involved in uranium mining, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/01/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/07/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/06/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/06/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/29/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/12/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/14/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/14/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/14/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/17/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/17/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/19/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/19/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 09/25/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/15/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/25/2018
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 09/05/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/06/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice05/01/2017 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce04/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2049. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2017)

Radiation Exposure Compensation Act Amendments of 2017

This bill amends the Radiation Exposure Compensation Act to extend the Radiation Exposure Compensation Trust Fund until 19 years after this bill's enactment. The trust fund compensates individuals who contract cancer or other diseases as a result of their exposure to radiation during nuclear testing undertaken by the United States during the Cold War.

The bill revises the requirements of that Act, including by:

  • increasing the amount of compensation that an individual may receive;
  • expanding the affected area to include Colorado, Idaho, Montana, and New Mexico;
  • expanding eligibility requirements to include additional individuals, such as certain employees of uranium mines or mills, or individuals who participated onsite in the cleanup of Enewetak Atoll (a ring of islands in the Pacific Ocean where nuclear testing occurred) from 1977 through 1980; and
  • extending until 19 years after this bill's enactment the statute of limitations for the filing of claims.

The National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences must establish a grant program for institutions of higher education to study the epidemiological impacts of uranium mining and milling among non-occupationally exposed individuals.

The bill amends the Energy Employees Occupational Illness Compensation Program Act of 2000 by expanding eligibility requirements for the Energy Employees Occupational Illness Compensation Program with respect to chronic beryllium disease.