There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Demonstration of Coverage for Low Vision Devices Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a Medicare demonstration project to evaluate the fiscal impact of covering low vision devices as durable medical equipment under part B of the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
04/21/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/07/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/06/2017 Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017 Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017 Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E475)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/28/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 04/28/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/07/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/06/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health04/21/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 10/20/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2050 - Medicare Demonstration of Coverage for Low Vision Devices Act of 2017.

Subjects (7)

  • Congressional oversight
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Health care coverage and access
  • Health technology, devices, supplies
  • Hearing, speech, and vision care
  • Medicare

Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.