There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Microloan Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Microloan Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Microloan Modernization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to provide for expanded participation in the microloan program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/24/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6180)
07/12/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-214.
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
07/25/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
07/24/2017-4:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2017-4:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6180)
07/24/2017-4:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2056.
07/24/2017-4:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6179-6181)
07/24/2017-4:26pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/12/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 150.
07/12/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-214.
06/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
06/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
04/06/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business04/06/2017 Referred to
06/15/2017 Markup by
07/12/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-214
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship07/25/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2056. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/24/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 12, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Microloan Modernization Act of 2017

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the Small Business Act, with respect to the Small Business Administration (SBA) Microloan Program (assisting low-income individuals to start and operate a small business), to increase from $5 million to $6 million the total amount of loans outstanding and committed to any particular intermediary (excluding outstanding grants) from the SBA business loan and investment fund for the remaining years of the intermediary's participation in the program.

(Sec. 4) SBA-designated microloan intermediary lenders may expend up to 50% (currently, 25%) of the intensive marketing, management, and technical assistance grant funds they receive from the SBA to provide information and technical assistance to small business concerns that are their prospective borrowers.

(Sec. 5) The SBA shall:

  • compare the operations of a representative sample of eligible intermediaries that participate in the microloan program and of eligible intermediaries that do not,
  • study the reasons why the latter do not participate,
  • recommend how to encourage increased participation by intermediaries in the microloan program, and
  • recommend how to decrease the associated costs for intermediary participation.

(Sec. 6) The Government Accountability Office shall evaluate:

  • SBA oversight of the microloan program, including oversight of participating intermediaries; and
  • the specific processes the SBA uses to ensure program compliance by participating intermediaries and overall microloan program performance.