There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

BREATHE Act
Bringing Reductions to Energy's Airborne Toxic Health Effects Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Clean Air Act to eliminate the exemption for aggregation of emissions from oil and gas sources, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/07/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/06/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/06/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/06/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/06/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 04/12/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/12/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 04/24/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/01/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/26/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/13/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/15/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/23/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/26/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/10/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 10/02/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/01/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/05/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment04/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2059. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2017)

Bringing Reductions to Energy's Airborne Toxic Health Effects Act or the BREATHE Act

This bill amends the Clean Air Act to revise requirements for hazardous air pollutants. Specifically, the bill allows: (1) emissions from oil or gas exploration or production wells and emissions from pipeline compressors or pump stations to be aggregated with emissions from other similar sources and regulated as a major source of toxic air pollutants, (2) emissions from those wells to be aggregated for purposes of emissions standards for hazardous air pollutants, and (3) emissions from oil or gas production wells to be regulated as an area source of toxic air pollutants.

The Environmental Protection Agency must: (1) issue a final rule adding hydrogen sulfide to the list of hazardous air pollutants; and (2) revise the list of air pollution sources within 365 days after issuing the rule to include categories and subcategories of major sources and area sources of hydrogen sulfide, including oil and gas wells.