There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the North Korean Human Rights Act of 2004, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
07/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-198. (TXT | PDF)
07/20/2018Signed by President.
07/10/2018Presented to President.
06/27/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5787-5788)
04/24/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/24/2018Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/25/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 531).(text: CR H7441-7442)
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
07/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-198. (TXT | PDF)
07/20/2018Signed by President.
07/10/2018HousePresented to President.
06/27/2018-4:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/27/2018-4:12pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5787-5788)
06/27/2018-4:11pmHouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5787-5788)
04/25/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/24/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/24/2018SenateS.Amdt.2240 Amendment SA 2240 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
04/24/2018SenateS.Amdt.2240 Amendment SA 2240 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S2396) In the nature of a substitute.
04/24/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2396)
04/24/2018SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/25/2017-7:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2017-7:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 531). (text: CR H7441-7442)
09/25/2017-6:53pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7473-7474)
09/25/2017-3:24pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/25/2017-3:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2061.
09/25/2017-3:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7441-7444)
09/25/2017-3:04pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
04/06/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/06/2017 Referred to
07/27/2017 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations09/26/2017 Referred to
04/24/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2061. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-198 (07/20/2018)

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2017

(Sec. 4) This bill provides for increased dissemination of news and information access to North Korea.

The North Korean Human Rights Act of 2004 is amended to include news rebroadcasting in supported broadcasting to North Korea.

(Sec. 5) The President may: (1) distribute or provide grants to distribute information receiving devices, electronically readable devices, and other informational sources into North Korea; and (2) provide grants to develop and distribute new products or methods to allow North Koreans easier access to outside information.

The Broadcasting Board of Governors may broadcast American, Korean, Chinese, and other popular music, television, movies, and popular cultural references as part of its programming.

The board shall broadcast to North Korea in the Korean language information on rights, laws, and freedoms afforded through the North Korean Constitution and through human rights treaties or other international agreements.

The bill urges that information access efforts should include religious communities and be coordinated with the Office of International Religious Freedom.

(Sec. 7) The President may provide grants for research on North Korea's denial of human rights.

The bill extends through FY2022: (1) programs that promote human rights, democracy, the rule of law, and the development of a market economy in North Korea; (2) actions to promote freedom of information in North Korea; and (3) humanitarian assistance to North Koreans who are outside of North Korea without the permission of the government.

The bill extends through 2022 annual reporting requirements regarding: (1) freedom of information, (2) North Korean human rights issues, (3) U.S. humanitarian assistance inside North Korea and to North Koreans outside of North Korea, and (4) the number of North Koreans seeking refugee status or political asylum in the United States.