There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Restoring the Patient's Voice Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 to require a group health plan (or health insurance coverage offered in connection with such a plan) to provide an exceptions process for any medication step therapy protocol, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/06/2017Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (88)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/25/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/25/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/13/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 06/13/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/20/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/22/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/22/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/14/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/14/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/18/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/06/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/06/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/06/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/06/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/13/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/13/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/13/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 09/25/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/26/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 09/28/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/25/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/25/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/25/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/30/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/30/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/05/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 12/05/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/12/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 12/12/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 12/21/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/30/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/08/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/05/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/08/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/08/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/08/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 03/14/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 03/14/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/11/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/11/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/12/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/17/2018
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/17/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/25/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/25/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/25/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/25/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/27/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/27/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/08/2018
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/15/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 05/15/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/15/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/15/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/25/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/25/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/25/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/25/2018
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/07/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/08/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 06/22/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/12/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/26/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/26/2018
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/26/2018
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 08/10/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 08/10/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 08/10/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/28/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 08/28/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/10/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/25/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 09/27/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 09/27/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/27/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/12/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/12/2018
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/12/2018
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/23/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/23/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/23/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce04/06/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2077.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2077. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2017)

Restoring the Patient's Voice Act of 2017

This bill amends the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA) to require a group health plan to establish an exception to medication step-therapy protocol in specified cases. A medication step-therapy protocol establishes a specific sequence in which prescription drugs are covered by a group health plan or a health insurance issuer. 

To warrant an exception to the protocol, at least one of the following circumstances must be met: (1) the treatment is contraindicated, (2) the treatment is expected to be ineffective, (3) the treatment will cause or is likely to cause an adverse reaction to the individual, (4) the treatment is expected to decrease the individual's ability either to perform daily activities or occupational responsibilities or adhere to the treatment plan, or (5) the individual is stable based on the prescription drugs already selected.

The bill requires a group health plan to implement a clear process for an individual to request an exception to the protocol.  The process shall be readily available on the website of the group health plan and must list the requirements for a request and any necessary forms and contact information.

Requests shall be granted no later than three days after receipt of the request.  In certain cases where the life, health, and ability of the individual are jeopardized by the protocol, the request shall be granted no later than 24 hours after receipt of the request.