There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Endangered Species Management Self-Determination Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to permit Governors of States to regulate intrastate endangered species and intrastate threatened species, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/25/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 05/11/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/19/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/23/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/20/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 08/08/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/25/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2134. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/2017)

Endangered Species Management Self-Determination Act

This bill amends the Endangered Species Act of 1973 (ESA) to require the Department of the Interior and the Department of Commerce to obtain the consent of each state for adding species to the list of threatened or endangered plants and animals when the species is present in the state.

Interior must submit to Congress a list of all endangered or threatened species. Congress must give its approval by a joint resolution before the list may take effect.

Species are automatically taken off the list after five years, but Interior may petition for the species to be relisted. Interested persons may no longer petition for the addition or removal of a species from the list.

A state may regulate intrastate endangered or threatened species that are present within its boundaries. If a state elects to regulate those species, it is given exclusive authority to manage species and their habitats. State action with respect to intrastate species is not subject to judicial review.

The Bonneville, Southeastern, Southwestern, and Western Area Power Administrations must include in customer monthly billing statements information on the share of costs to the customer incurred as a result of compliance with the ESA, unless the costs are for intrastate species regulated by states.

Owners or lessees of property may apply to Interior for a determination of whether a proposed property use will violate the ESA. The use is deemed compliant if Interior fails to respond within 90 days. The owners and lessees may seek monetary compensation for unfavorable determinations.

The bill eliminates awards of attorney fees in citizen suits under the ESA.