There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Clarifying Commercial Real Estate Loans

Short Titles as Reported to House

Clarifying Commercial Real Estate Loans

Short Titles as Introduced

Clarifying Commercial Real Estate Loans

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to clarify capital requirements for certain acquisition, development, or construction loans.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8547-8548)
11/06/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-392.
04/26/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/08/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
11/07/2017-2:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/07/2017-2:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8547-8548)
11/07/2017-2:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2148.
11/07/2017-2:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8547-8550)
11/07/2017-2:23pmHouseMr. Huizenga moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/06/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 288.
11/06/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-392.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 59 - 1.
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/11/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/12/2017HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit
04/26/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
04/26/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services04/26/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
11/06/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-392
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit07/12/2017 Hearings by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2148. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/07/2017)

Clarifying Commercial Real Estate Loans

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to specify that a federal banking agency may not subject a depository institution to higher capital standards with respect to a high-volatility commercial real-estate (HVCRE) exposure unless the exposure is an HVCRE acquisition, development, or construction (ADC) loan.

An HVCRE ADC loan is a one that: (1) is secured by land or improved real property; (2) has the purpose of providing financing to acquire, develop, or improve the real property such that the property becomes income-producing; and (3) is dependent upon future income or sales proceeds from, or refinancing of, the real property for the repayment of the loan.

An HVCRE ADC loan does not include financing for a one- to four-family residential property, agricultural land, real property that would qualify as an investment in community development, existing income-producing real property secured by a mortgage, or certain commercial real-property projects. Furthermore, such a loan does not include any loan made prior to January 1, 2015.

A depository institution may reclassify a loan as a non-HVCRE ADC loan if the depository institution is satisfied that: (1) the acquisition, development, or improvement of real property being financed by the loan is complete; and (2) the cash flow being generated by the real property is sufficient to support the debt service and expenses of the real property.