There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To rename the Red River Valley Agricultural Research Center in Fargo, North Dakota, as the Edward T. Schafer Agricultural Research Center.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
03/27/2018Became Public Law No: 115-157. (TXT | PDF)
03/27/2018Signed by President.
03/20/2018Presented to President.
03/14/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/14/2018Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1739)
05/17/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4274)
05/16/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 115-125.
04/26/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
03/27/2018Became Public Law No: 115-157. (TXT | PDF)
03/27/2018Signed by President.
03/20/2018HousePresented to President.
03/15/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/14/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/14/2018SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1739)
05/18/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
05/17/2017-4:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/17/2017-4:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4274)
05/17/2017-4:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2154.
05/17/2017-4:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4274-4275)
05/17/2017-4:08pmHouseMr. Davis, Rodney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/16/2017HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 48.
05/16/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 115-125.
05/03/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/03/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/26/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
04/26/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture04/26/2017 Referred to
05/03/2017 Markup by
05/16/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-125
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry05/18/2017 Referred to
03/14/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2154. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-157 (03/27/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill renames the Red River Valley Agricultural Research Center in Fargo, North Dakota, as the "Edward T. Schafer Agricultural Research Center."