There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to eliminate the non-application of certain State waiver provisions to Members of Congress and congressional staff.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/04/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 429 - 0 (Roll no. 255).(text: CR H4139)
04/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/07/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/04/2017-2:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/04/2017-2:11pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 429 - 0 (Roll no. 255). (text: CR H4139)
05/04/2017-1:52pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4170-4171)
05/04/2017-12:26pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 2192, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Burgess demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage of H.R. 2192 until later in the legislative day.
05/04/2017-12:25pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
05/04/2017-11:12amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2192.
05/04/2017-11:11amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2192 and H.R. 1628. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2192 under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit. Rule also provides for further consideration of H.R. 1628 and provides that further amendments printed in House Report 115-109 be considered as adopted.
05/04/2017-11:11amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 308. (consideration: CR H4139-4149)
05/03/2017-10:15pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 308 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2192 and H.R. 1628. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2192 under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit. Rule also provides for further consideration of H.R. 1628 and provides that further amendments printed in House Report 115-109 be considered as adopted.
04/28/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/27/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/27/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/28/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/28/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 04/28/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/28/2017
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/28/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 04/28/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/28/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/28/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/28/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/28/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 04/28/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 05/01/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/01/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/01/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/02/2017
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 05/02/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/03/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 05/03/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/03/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 05/04/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 05/04/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/04/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/27/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/28/2017 Referred to
House Administration04/27/2017 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2192. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/04/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act, if the American Health Care Act (H.R. 1628) is enacted, to make plans made available by the federal government to Members of Congress and congressional staff subject to state waivers of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) requirement for health insurance to cover the essential health benefits and PPACA restrictions on premium variation by age and health status.