There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Energy to establish an energy efficiency materials pilot program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/28/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/27/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/27/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/27/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/01/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/01/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/15/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/15/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 05/19/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 05/19/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/24/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/07/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/20/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/11/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 07/14/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/05/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 09/05/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/05/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/07/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 11/03/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/07/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/15/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/27/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy04/28/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2197. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/27/2017)

This bill requires the Department of Energy to establish a pilot program to award grants for providing nonprofit buildings with energy-efficiency materials.

The bill reduces the authorization of appropriations for the zero net energy commercial buildings initiative for FY2018.