There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the expansion of an existing hydroelectric project, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-201. (TXT | PDF)
07/20/2018Signed by President.
07/12/2018Presented to President.
06/28/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4809)
06/27/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 1 (Roll no. 330).(text: CR H5204)
06/02/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-154.
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
07/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-201. (TXT | PDF)
07/20/2018Signed by President.
07/12/2018HousePresented to President.
06/29/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/28/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4809)
06/28/2017SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 159.
06/27/2017-4:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/27/2017-4:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 1 (Roll no. 330). (text: CR H5204)
06/27/2017-4:21pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5218-5219)
06/27/2017-2:13pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/27/2017-2:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 220.
06/27/2017-2:09pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5204-5205)
06/27/2017-2:09pmHouseMr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/02/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 101.
06/02/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-154.
04/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
04/27/2017HouseSubcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
04/27/2017HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
04/03/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans
02/10/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/10/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/03/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/03/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/03/2017 Referred to
04/27/2017 Markup by
06/02/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-154
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans02/10/2017 Referred to
04/03/2017 Hearings by
04/27/2017 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/10/2017 Referred to
04/27/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.220. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-201 (07/20/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the licensee for the Terror Lake Hydroelectric Project in Kodiak Island, Alaska, to occupy not more than 20 acres of federal land to construct, operate, and maintain the Upper Hidden Basin Diversion Expansion without further authorization under the Alaska National Interest Lands Conservation Act or from the Department of the Interior.