There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the community living center of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Butler Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Sergeant Joseph George Kusick VA Community Living Center".


Actions Overview (6)

Date
08/16/2017Became Public Law No: 115-47. (TXT | PDF)
08/16/2017Signed by President.
08/07/2017Presented to President.
08/01/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4687)
07/17/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 379).(text: CR H5890)
04/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
08/16/2017Became Public Law No: 115-47. (TXT | PDF)
08/16/2017Signed by President.
08/07/2017HousePresented to President.
08/02/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4687)
07/18/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/17/2017-6:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/17/2017-6:55pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 379). (text: CR H5890)
07/17/2017-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5901)
07/17/2017-4:58pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/17/2017-4:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2210.
07/17/2017-4:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5890-5892)
07/17/2017-4:45pmHouseMr. Dunn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/27/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/27/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/27/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/27/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health04/27/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2210. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-47 (08/16/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 2) This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs community living center in Butler Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Sergeant Joseph George Kusick VA Community Living Center."