There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Anti-Border Corruption Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Anti-Border Corruption Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Anti-Border Corruption Act of 2010 to authorize certain polygraph waiver authority, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 282 - 137 (Roll no. 294).(text: CR H4676-4677)
05/16/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-121.
04/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
06/08/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/07/2017-5:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/07/2017-5:06pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 282 - 137 (Roll no. 294). (text: CR H4676-4677)
06/07/2017-4:53pmHouseH.Amdt.127 On agreeing to the Lujan Grisham, M. amendment (A002) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 179 - 238 (Roll no. 293).
06/07/2017-4:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4687-4688)
06/07/2017-3:56pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of the debate on the Lujan Grisham amendment, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McCaul requested the Yeas and Nays and pursuant to the order of the House of June 7, 2017 the Chair postponed further proceedings on the adoption of the Lujan Grisham amendment until a time to be announced.
06/07/2017-3:55pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/07/2017-3:45pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 374, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lujan Grisham (NM) amendment.
06/07/2017-3:45pmHouseH.Amdt.127 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Lujan Grisham, M.. (consideration: CR H4683-4684; text: CR H4683)
06/07/2017-3:07pmHouseORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mr. McCaul asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting the amendment to H.R. 2213 may be subject to postponement as though under clause 8 of rule 20. Agreed to without objection.
06/07/2017-3:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2213.
06/07/2017-3:05pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2213 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order.
06/07/2017-3:05pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 374. (consideration: CR H4676-4684)
06/07/2017-2:27pmHouseRule H. Res. 374 passed House.
06/06/2017-7:21pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 374 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2213 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order.
05/16/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 74.
05/16/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-121.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/03/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/03/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
04/27/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
04/27/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security04/27/2017 Referred to
05/03/2017 Markup by
05/16/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-121
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2213. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/07/2017)

Anti-Border Corruption Reauthorization Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Anti-Border Corruption Act of 2010 to expand the authority of the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to waive the administration of polygraph examinations to civilian and military applicants for law enforcement positions in the CBP. This expanded waiver authority terminates five years after the enactment of this bill.

(Sec. 3) An individual who receives such a waiver is not exempt from other hiring requirements relating to suitability for employment and eligibility to hold a national security designated position.

Any individual who receives a waiver and holds a current Tier 4 (High Risk Public Trust) background investigation shall be subject to a Tier 5 (Critical Sensitive and Special Sensitive National Security) background investigation.

The CBP may administer a polygraph examination to an applicant or employee who receives a waiver if information is discovered prior to the completion of a background investigation that results in a determination that a polygraph examination is necessary to make a final determination regarding suitability for employment or continued employment.

The CBP shall provide Congress information on the number of waivers requested, granted, and denied, and the reasons for any such denial, and the final outcome of the application for employment at issue. Such information shall also include the number of instances a polygraph examination was administered, the result of any such examination, and the final outcome of the application for employment at issue.