Committees: H.R.2219 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/27/2017 Referred to
12/14/2017 Markup by
02/23/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-569,Part 2
House Financial Services04/27/2017 Referred to
12/12/2017 Markup by
12/13/2017 Markup by
02/20/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-569,Part 1
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Terrorism and Illicit Finance11/29/2017 Hearings by
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit11/29/2017 Hearings by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/11/2018 Referred to