There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Community Protection and Preparedness Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to provide for a rail spill preparedness fund, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/01/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/01/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/28/2017Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/17/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/17/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/25/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/28/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management05/01/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials05/01/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2223.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2223. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/2017)

Community Protection and Preparedness Act of 2017

This bill requires the Department of Transportation (DOT), annually, to impose a $1,500 fee for each DOT-111 specification railroad tank car used to transport Class 3 flammable liquids during the previous fiscal year that did not meet DOT-117, DOT-117P, or DOT-117R specifications at the time it was used. Such fee shall be paid by each person who causes such liquids to be transported by such car in commerce and not by the railroad carrier that transports such liquids.

Collected fees shall be deposited into a Rail Account established within the Oil Spill Liability Trust Fund and shall be available only for:

  • the payment of removal and remediation costs and other costs, expenses, claims, and damages related to an accident or incident involving the transportation of Class 3 flammable liquids by rail; and
  • DOT grants to states and Indian tribes to develop emergency plans and to train regional hazardous material emergency response teams and public employees responding to such an accident or incident.

The Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration shall issue a final rule relating to the notice of proposed rulemaking issued on July 29, 2016, "Hazardous Materials: Oil Spill Response Plans and Information Sharing for High-Hazard Flammable Trains."

Necessary amounts are authorized for the Federal Railroad Administration to hire at least two additional track safety specialists per region.

DOT shall:

  • assess the adequacy of railroad track inspections, training provided to railroad track inspectors and related personnel, railroad compliance with federal track safety regulations, and federal oversight of railroad track safety; and
  • evaluate the leading causes of track defects, particularly along train routes traversed by passengers and hazardous materials.