There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Law Enforcement Mental Health and Wellness Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Law Enforcement Mental Health and Wellness Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Law Enforcement Mental Health and Wellness Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Law Enforcement Mental Health and Wellness Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide support for law enforcement agency efforts to protect the mental health and well-being of law enforcement officers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
01/10/2018Became Public Law No: 115-113. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2018Signed by President.
12/29/2017Presented to President.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/21/2017Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8279)
11/28/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9449)
11/28/2017Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-428.
04/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
01/10/2018Became Public Law No: 115-113. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2018Signed by President.
12/29/2017HousePresented to President.
12/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/21/2017SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8279)
11/29/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
11/28/2017-5:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/28/2017-5:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9449)
11/28/2017-5:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2228.
11/28/2017-5:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9449-9454)
11/28/2017-5:21pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/28/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 317.
11/28/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-428.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/11/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/28/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
04/28/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/28/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
11/28/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-428
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations05/11/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary11/29/2017 Referred to
12/21/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2228. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-113 (01/10/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on November 28, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Law Enforcement Mental Health and Wellness Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Justice (DOJ) to report on Department of Defense and Department of Veterans Affairs mental health practices and services that could be adopted by law enforcement agencies.

Additionally, DOJ's Office of Community Oriented Policing Services must report on programs to address the psychological health and well-being of law enforcement officers.

The bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to expand the allowable use of grant funds under the Community Oriented Policing Services program to include establishing peer mentoring mental health and wellness pilot programs within state, local, and tribal law enforcement agencies.

(Sec. 3) DOJ must coordinate with the Department of Health and Human Services to develop educational resources for mental health providers regarding the culture of law enforcement agencies and therapies for mental health issues common to law enforcement officers.

(Sec. 4) DOJ must also: (1) review existing crisis hotlines, recommend improvements, and research annual mental health checks; (2) examine the mental health and wellness needs of federal officers; (3) ensure that recommendations, resources, or programs under this bill protect the privacy of participating officers; and (4) report to Congress on findings and final recommendations.