There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Joint Committee on the Library to obtain a statue or bust of Elie Wiesel for placement in the United States Capitol.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/28/2017Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E565)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/28/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/28/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 04/28/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/28/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/16/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 05/16/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/17/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/19/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/19/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/19/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/19/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/19/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/19/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/19/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/19/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/19/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 05/19/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 05/19/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/06/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/06/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/06/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 06/06/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/23/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/23/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/23/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/01/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 09/01/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/11/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/11/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/23/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 10/23/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/23/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 10/23/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 10/23/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/23/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/23/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 10/23/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/23/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/06/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 06/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration04/28/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2230.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2230. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/2017)

This bill requires the Joint Committee on the Library to enter into an agreement to obtain a statue or bust of Eli Wiesel.

The Joint Committee may authorize the Architect of the Capitol to enter into the agreement and related contracts.

The Joint Committee shall place the statue or bust in a suitable permanent location in the U.S. Capitol.