There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Polar Bear Conservation and Fairness Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Polar Bear Conservation and Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to allow importation of polar bear trophies taken in sport hunts in Canada before the date the polar bear was determined to be a threatened species under the Endangered Species Act of 1973, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/12/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-735.
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
06/12/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 570.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-735.
05/16/2018Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/16/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/16/2018Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
05/16/2018Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 07/11/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/03/2017 Referred to
05/16/2018 Markup by
06/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-735
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/10/2017 Referred to
05/16/2018 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans02/10/2017 Referred to
05/16/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.224. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (06/12/2018)

Polar Bear Conservation and Fairness Act

This bill amends the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to direct the Department of the Interior to issue a permit for the importation of a polar bear part (other than an internal organ) from a bear taken in a sport hunt in Canada to a permit applicant who has submitted proof that the polar bear was: (1) legally harvested by the applicant before the May 15, 2008, listing of the polar bear as threatened, and (2) harvested from an approved polar bear population. Interior must issue these permits without regard to limits on importing marine mammals with depleted populations.