There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Secretary of the Interior from revising the approved oil and gas leasing program for fiscal years 2017 through 2022.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/11/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/28/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/01/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 05/03/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/11/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/11/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 05/11/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 05/11/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/11/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/11/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/22/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/07/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/07/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/07/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/07/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/07/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/07/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/08/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/08/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/13/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/13/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 06/13/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/13/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/13/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/13/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/13/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/15/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/20/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/20/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/22/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/22/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/22/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/22/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/22/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/22/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/24/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/25/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/31/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/09/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 01/09/2018
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 07/26/2018
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/26/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 09/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/28/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources05/11/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2248. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/2017)

This bill prohibits the Department of the Interior from revising the approved Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program for FY2017-FY2022. (Interior approved the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management's proposed final Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program for FY2017-FY2022 on January 17, 2017.)