There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Responsible Disposal Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Responsible Disposal Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Responsible Disposal Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To extend the authorization of the Uranium Mill Tailings Radiation Control Act of 1978 relating to the disposal site in Mesa County, Colorado.

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the authorization of the Uranium Mill Tailing Radiation Control Act of 1978 relating to the disposal site in Mesa County, Colorado.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8801)
09/07/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-925.
05/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 584.
09/25/2018-4:50pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-4:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-4:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8801)
09/25/2018-4:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2278.
09/25/2018-4:43pmHouseMr. McKinley moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2018-4:43pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8801-8802)
09/07/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 718.
09/07/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-925.
07/12/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/27/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment
06/27/2018HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment
05/18/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment
05/05/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/01/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/01/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/01/2017 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
09/07/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-925
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment05/05/2017 Referred to
05/18/2018 Hearings by
06/27/2018 Markup by
06/27/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2278. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/25/2018)

Responsible Disposal Reauthorization Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Uranium Mill Tailings Radiation Control Act of 1978 to extend through FY2030 authorization for the Department of Energy to operate the Cheney disposal cell in Mesa County, Colorado.