Text: H.R.2278 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (09/26/2018)

Calendar No. 584

115th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 2278


To extend the authorization of the Uranium Mill Tailings Radiation Control Act of 1978 relating to the disposal site in Mesa County, Colorado.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

September 26, 2018

Received; read twice and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To extend the authorization of the Uranium Mill Tailings Radiation Control Act of 1978 relating to the disposal site in Mesa County, Colorado.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Responsible Disposal Reauthorization Act of 2018”.

SEC. 2. Authorization.

Section 112(a)(1)(B) of the Uranium Mill Tailings Radiation Control Act of 1978 (42 U.S.C. 7922(a)(1)(B)) is amended by striking “September 30, 2023” and inserting “September 30, 2030”.

Passed the House of Representatives September 25, 2018.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk.  


Calendar No. 584

115th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 2278

AN ACT
To extend the authorization of the Uranium Mill Tailings Radiation Control Act of 1978 relating to the disposal site in Mesa County, Colorado.

September 26, 2018
Received; read twice and placed on the calendar
Share This