There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

School-Based Respiratory Health Management Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to increase the preference given, in awarding certain allergies and reversible lower airway disorders-related grants, to States that allow trained school personnel to administer rescue medications for allergies and reversible lower airway disorders, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/05/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/02/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/02/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/16/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/23/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/23/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/23/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/26/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/26/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/23/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/18/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/28/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/28/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/28/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/28/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/07/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/08/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/12/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/12/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/13/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/25/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/25/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/02/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/04/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 10/04/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/04/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/11/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/11/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/23/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/26/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/31/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/14/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/05/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/29/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/06/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/02/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/05/2017 Referred to

As of 06/18/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2285 - School-Based Respiratory Health Management Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2285. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/02/2017)

School-Based Respiratory Health Management Act

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to revise the conditions under which the Department of Health and Human Services, in making asthma-related grants, gives preference to a state. A preference is given to states that require elementary and secondary schools to have: (1) on the premises during operating hours at least one individual trained in the administration of rescue medications for allergies and reversible lower airway disorders, and (2) an allergies and reversible lower airway disorders management program. Currently, this preference is given to states that require schools to have on the premises an individual trained in the administration of epinephrine to a student having a severe allergic reaction.

To be eligible for this preference, a state must have civil liability protections for trained individuals who administer rescue medications for allergies and reversible lower airway disorders.