There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans Appeals Improvement and Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Appeals Improvement and Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Appeals Improvement and Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Appeals Improvement and Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans Appeals Improvement and Modernization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to reform the rights and processes relating to appeals of decisions regarding claims for benefits under the laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
08/23/2017Became Public Law No: 115-55. (TXT | PDF)
08/23/2017Signed by President.
08/11/2017Presented to President.
08/11/2017Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR H6595-6601; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H6595-6601)
08/01/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2017Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 273).(text: CR H4457-4463)
05/19/2017Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-135.
05/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/23/2017Became Public Law No: 115-55. (TXT | PDF)
08/23/2017Signed by President.
08/11/2017HousePresented to President.
08/11/2017-9:04amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/11/2017-9:04amHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H6595-6601; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H6595-6601)
08/11/2017-9:04amHouseMrs. Comstock asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment.
08/02/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2017SenateS.Amdt.745 Amendment SA 745 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2017SenateS.Amdt.745 Amendment SA 745 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Isakson. (consideration: CR S4687; text: CR S4674-4680) In the nature of a substitute.
08/01/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4687)
08/01/2017SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/24/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/23/2017-5:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2017-5:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 273). (text: CR H4457-4463)
05/23/2017-4:48pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4483)
05/23/2017-3:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/23/2017-2:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2288.
05/23/2017-2:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4457-4466)
05/23/2017-2:38pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/19/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 84.
05/19/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-135.
05/17/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/17/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/02/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/02/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/02/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
05/19/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-135
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/24/2017 Referred to
08/01/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2288. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-55 (08/23/2017)

Veterans Appeals Improvement and Modernization Act of 2017

This bill revises the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) disability claims appeals system.

(Sec. 2) Specifically, the bill requires the VA to assist with a claim or supplemental claim up until a veteran claimant is provided notice of a decision. Additionally, the VA must assist a veteran during a higher-level review if an adjudicator identifies an error on the part of the agency of original jurisdiction.

The bill also requires the VA to provide a notice of decision to veterans regarding decisions affecting the provision of benefits that includes specific information, such as a summary of the applicable laws and an explanation of how to obtain evidence used in making the decision.

Under the bill, findings that are favorable to the veteran are considered binding unless clear and convincing evidence is shown to rebut the findings.

The bill permits a veteran to appeal a decision within one year by (1) requesting a review of the agency of original jurisdiction's decision by a higher-level adjudicator using the same evidentiary record; (2) filing a supplemental claim with a regional office that includes the opportunity to submit additional evidence and have a hearing; or (3) appealing directly to the Board of Veterans' Appeals, with the opportunity to select an expedited review to submit new evidence but without a hearing, or to select a review with the option to submit new evidence and request a hearing.

The bill authorizes veterans to retain the services of attorneys and accredited agents who charge a fee when the agency of original jurisdiction provides notice of the original decision.

The bill prescribes specific procedures on the filing of a notice of disagreement with the Board of Veterans' Appeals, including form and timing. If no notice of disagreement is filed, the decision becomes final except in certain circumstances.

The bill modifies the maintenance of dockets by the Board of Veterans' Appeals and the procedures for advancing the docket and holding hearings.

The bill sets forth the type of evidence that is permitted in the record for cases with a request for hearing, and also for cases with no request for a hearing. Additionally, the bill requires the Board of Veterans' Appeals to provide written notice to the appellant if the board does not review evidence that the veteran did not submit in time.

The bill requires the VA, prior to full implementation, to certify to Congress that it has sufficient resources and personnel to carry out the existing and updated appeals systems.

(Sec. 3) Under the bill, the VA must submit a comprehensive plan for resolving pending appeals, and implementing the updated appeals system.

(Sec. 4) The bill authorizes the VA to carry out various pilot programs to test the updated appeals system and alternative processes as long as it notifies Congress of such testing.

(Sec. 5) Lastly, the bill requires the VA to publish information on the VA's website regarding the processing of existing appeals and appeals in the updated system.