There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 259 Nassau Street, Suite 2 in Princeton, New Jersey, as the "Dr. John F. Nash, Jr. Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/23/2018Became Public Law No: 115-143. (TXT | PDF)
03/23/2018Signed by President.
03/13/2018Presented to President.
03/07/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S1525-1527)
02/15/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
10/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7948)
05/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
03/23/2018Became Public Law No: 115-143. (TXT | PDF)
03/23/2018Signed by President.
03/13/2018HousePresented to President.
03/08/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/07/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1525-1527)
02/15/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 321.
02/15/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
02/14/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/16/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
10/11/2017-3:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/11/2017-3:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7948)
10/11/2017-3:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2302.
10/11/2017-3:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7948)
10/11/2017-3:08pmHouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/02/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/02/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform05/02/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/16/2017 Referred to
02/14/2018 Markup by
02/15/2018 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2302.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2302. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-143 (03/23/2018)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 259 Nassau Street, Suite 2 in Princeton, New Jersey, as the "Dr. John F. Nash, Jr. Post Office."