Text: H.R.2316 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (10/03/2017)


115th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2316


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

October 3, 2017

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources


AN ACT

To amend the Mineral Leasing Act and the Energy Policy Act of 1992 to repeal provisions relating only to the Allegheny National Forest.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Cooperative Management of Mineral Rights Act of 2017”.

SEC. 2. Repeal of provisions regarding the Allegheny National Forest.

(a) Repeal.—Subsection (o) of section 17 of the Mineral Leasing Act (30 U.S.C. 226) and section 2508 of the Energy Policy Act of 1992 (Public Law 102–486; 106 Stat. 3108) are repealed.

(b) Notice requirement not affected.—Nothing in this Act shall be construed or interpreted—

(1) to limit, modify, or otherwise affect the existing requirement to provide in writing 60-day advance notice of specific activities in accordance with the order dated December 16, 1980, in the case United States of America v. Minard Run Oil Company, 1980 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 9570 (W.D. Pa., Dec. 16, 1980); or

(2) to limit existing authority of the Forest Service under provisions of law codified in section 551 of title 16, United States Code.

(c) Permitting authority not affected.—Nothing in this Act shall be construed or interpreted to alter, repeal, or otherwise limit the existing authority of the Forest Service to permit the harvest or sale of timber derived from the Allegheny National Forest.

Passed the House of Representatives October 2, 2017.

    Attest: karen l. haas,   
    Clerk