There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Coast Guard Commemorative Coin Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration of the United States Coast Guard.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (110)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/03/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 05/03/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/03/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/03/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/03/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/16/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/18/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/18/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/22/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/13/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/13/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/05/2018
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/05/2018
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/05/2018
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/05/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/05/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 02/05/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/05/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/05/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/05/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/10/2018
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/10/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/10/2018
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/10/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/10/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/10/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/10/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/10/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/10/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/10/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/17/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/18/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/18/2018
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/18/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/18/2018
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/26/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/26/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/26/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 04/26/2018
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/26/2018
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/26/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 04/26/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/26/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/26/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/15/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/15/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/15/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/15/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/15/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/15/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/24/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/29/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/29/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/29/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/29/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/29/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/03/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2317. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/03/2017)

United States Coast Guard Commemorative Coin Act of 2017

This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue in commemoration of the U.S. Coast Guard: (1) $5 gold coins, (2) $1 silver coins, and (3) half-dollar clad coins.

The design of such coins shall be emblematic of the traditions, history, and heritage of the Coast Guard and its role in securing the United States since 1790.

The bill prescribes certain design requirements.

The issuance of such coins is restricted to the one-year period beginning on January 1, 2020.

The bill prescribes the sale price of the coins and coin surcharges. Surcharges shall be paid by Treasury to the National Coast Guard Museum Association to help finance the design, construction, operations, and maintenance of this museum.

Treasury shall ensure that minting and issuing coins under this bill will not result in any net cost to the federal government.