There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Consumer Financial Choice and Capital Markets Protection Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Consumer Financial Choice and Capital Markets Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect the investment choices of investors in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/24/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-903.
05/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
08/24/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 699.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/24/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-903.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
01/18/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 21.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
01/18/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
01/17/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/03/2017Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
05/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/17/2017
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 05/18/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/22/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/22/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/07/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/07/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/07/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/07/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/07/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 06/07/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/07/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/07/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/20/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/22/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/27/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 07/11/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/11/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/11/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/12/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/20/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/20/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/20/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/26/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/28/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 08/01/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/18/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 08/18/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 08/18/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 09/05/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 09/05/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/05/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 09/06/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/06/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/08/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 09/08/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/08/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/08/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/12/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/14/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/14/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/25/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/25/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/27/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 09/28/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 10/10/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/10/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/10/2017
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 10/10/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/12/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 10/12/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/24/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 10/24/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/25/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 11/01/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/05/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 12/05/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 12/06/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 12/07/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 12/19/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/19/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/29/2018
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 01/29/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 02/14/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 02/26/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 02/26/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/05/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/05/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 04/10/2018
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/25/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/26/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/03/2017 Referred to
01/18/2018 Markup by
08/24/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-903
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises11/03/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2319. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (08/24/2018)

Consumer Financial Choice and Capital Markets Protection Act of 2018

This bill amends the Investment Company Act of 1940 to allow a money market fund, under specified conditions, to elect to operate using a different method of valuation than is otherwise required.

Under specified conditions, a money market fund shall not be subject to certain requirements related to the imposition of liquidity fees.

Certain federal assistance may not be provided directly to any money market fund. This limitation on federal assistance must be disclosed in a money market fund's advertising and sales literature.