There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Safe Freight Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to provide for the minimum size of crews of freight trains, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/04/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (120)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 01/24/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/24/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/24/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/24/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/30/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/30/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/30/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/30/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 01/31/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/31/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/01/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/06/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/06/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/13/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 02/13/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/27/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/27/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 02/27/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 02/27/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/27/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/01/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/01/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/07/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 03/16/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/16/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/21/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/27/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 03/27/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/04/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/06/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/25/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/25/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/13/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/14/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/14/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 06/26/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 06/29/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 06/29/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/29/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/29/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/29/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/11/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/11/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 07/18/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/19/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/26/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/27/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/27/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/27/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/12/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/12/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 10/03/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/03/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 10/03/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 10/12/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/12/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/23/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/24/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/24/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/24/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/24/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/25/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/26/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/06/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 11/08/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 11/16/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/28/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 11/30/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 12/05/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/06/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/06/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 12/18/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/17/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/06/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/06/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 02/06/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/06/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/06/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/06/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/15/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/26/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/11/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/11/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/11/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/11/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/11/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/12/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/12/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/26/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/26/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/26/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/26/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/26/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 04/26/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/09/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 05/09/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/10/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/10/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/16/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/16/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/22/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/22/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/24/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/14/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/14/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/14/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/25/2018
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/13/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 07/24/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/24/2018
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/26/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 07/26/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 09/04/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 09/04/2018
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 12/21/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/03/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials01/04/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.233. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

Safe Freight Act of 2017

This bill prohibits the operation of a freight train or light locomotive engine used in the movement of freight unless it has a crew of at least two individuals, one of whom is certified by the Federal Railroad Administration as a locomotive operator and the other as a train conductor.