There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Connected Government Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Connected Government Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Connected Government Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Connected Government Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Connected Government Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a new or updated Federal website that is intended for use by the public to be mobile friendly, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/10/2018Became Public Law No: 115-114. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2018Signed by President.
12/29/2017Presented to President.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8279)
11/15/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 634).
11/13/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-406.
05/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
01/10/2018Became Public Law No: 115-114. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2018Signed by President.
12/29/2017HousePresented to President.
12/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8279)
11/16/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/15/2017-2:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/15/2017-2:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 634).
11/15/2017-2:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9280)
11/13/2017-4:26pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/13/2017-4:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2331.
11/13/2017-4:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9142-9143; text: CR H9142)
11/13/2017-4:19pmHouseMr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/13/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300.
11/13/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-406.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/03/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/03/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/23/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform05/03/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Markup by
11/13/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-406

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2331. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-114 (01/10/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on November 15, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Connected Government Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires: (1) a federal agency that creates or redesigns a website intended for use by the public to ensure that the website is mobile friendly, and (2) the Office of Management and Budget to report on agency compliance.

"Mobile friendly" means that the website is configured in such a way that it may be navigated, viewed, and accessed on a smartphone, tablet computer, or similar mobile device.