There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Small Business Investment Opportunity Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Business Investment Opportunity Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Small Business Investment Opportunity Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Investment Opportunity Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Small Business Investment Opportunity Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 to increase the amount of leverage made available to small business investment companies.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
06/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-187. (TXT | PDF)
06/21/2018Signed by President.
06/13/2018Presented to President.
06/05/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/05/2018Senate Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2998)
07/24/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6178)
07/12/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-215.
05/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
06/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-187. (TXT | PDF)
06/21/2018Signed by President.
06/13/2018HousePresented to President.
06/06/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/05/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/05/2018SenateSenate Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2998)
07/25/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
07/24/2017-4:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2017-4:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6178)
07/24/2017-4:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2333.
07/24/2017-4:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6178-6179)
07/24/2017-4:13pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/12/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 151.
07/12/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-215.
06/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
06/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/03/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
05/03/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/03/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business05/03/2017 Referred to
06/15/2017 Markup by
07/12/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-215
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship07/25/2017 Referred to
06/05/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2333. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/24/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 12, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Small Business Investment Opportunity Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 to increase the maximum amount of outstanding leverage (i.e., borrowing power) made available to any licensed small business investment company from $150 million to $175 million.