There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Strengthening Career and Technical Education for the 21st Century Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Strengthening Career and Technical Education for the 21st Century Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Strengthening Career and Technical Education for the 21st Century Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Carl D. Perkins Career and Technical Education Act of 2006.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/22/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5067-5076)
06/07/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-164.
05/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
06/26/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
06/22/2017-2:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/22/2017-2:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5067-5076)
06/22/2017-1:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2353.
06/22/2017-1:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5067-5082)
06/22/2017-1:46pmHouseMr. Thompson (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/07/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 109.
06/07/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-164.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/17/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/17/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
05/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/08/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 05/11/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/16/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/16/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 05/16/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/16/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/17/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 05/18/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 05/18/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/18/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/19/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/19/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/22/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 05/23/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/23/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 05/24/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/26/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 05/26/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/06/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/06/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/06/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/06/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 06/06/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/06/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/06/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/07/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/07/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 06/07/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 06/07/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/04/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
06/07/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-164
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/26/2017 Referred to

As of 06/20/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2353 - Strengthening Career and Technical Education for the 21st Century Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2353. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/04/2017)

Strengthening Career and Technical Education for the 21st Century Act

This bill reauthorizes through FY2023 and increases funding levels for Department of Education (ED) grants to states, national programs, and tribally controlled postsecondary career and technical education (CTE) institutions under the Carl D. Perkins Career and Technical Education Act of 2006 to support CTE programs for secondary and postsecondary students. It repeals the authorization for certain occupational and information activities and the separate mandate for tech prep education.

Beginning in FY2021, states must receive at least 90% of their previous year's allocation of basic state CTE grants.

The bill permits states to:

  • reserve up to 15% (currently 10%) of their grant funds for innovative CTE activities in rural areas or areas with higher numbers of CTE students, and
  • set their own annual targets on the core indicators of performance at both the secondary and postsecondary education levels without ED's approval.

The bill modifies grant application processes for states and localities and performance measures for evaluating CTE programs. It prohibits ED from withholding funds from states that do not meet certain performance measures.

The bill amends the Wagner-Peyser Act to expand the duties of state agencies with respect to providing workforce and labor market information.