There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Investing in Main Street Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Investing in Main Street Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Investing in Main Street Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 to increase the amount that certain banks and savings associations may invest in small business investment companies, subject to the approval of the appropriate Federal banking agency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/24/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6181-6182)
07/12/2017Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-216.
05/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/25/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
07/24/2017-4:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2017-4:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6181-6182)
07/24/2017-4:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2364.
07/24/2017-4:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6181-6183)
07/24/2017-4:40pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/12/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 152.
07/12/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-216.
06/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
06/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
05/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
05/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 05/04/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business05/04/2017 Referred to
06/15/2017 Markup by
07/12/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-216
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs07/25/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2364. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/24/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Investing in Main Street Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 to increase from 5% to 15% of its capital and surplus, the amount a national bank, a member bank of the Federal Reserve System, a nonmember insured bank (to the extent permitted under applicable state law), or a federal savings association may invest in one or more small business investment companies (SBICs), or in any entity established to invest solely in SBICs. The increase is subject to the approval of the appropriate federal banking agency.