There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Escambia County Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Escambia County Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Escambia County Land Conveyance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize Escambia County, Florida, to convey certain property that was formerly part of Santa Rosa Island National Monument and that was conveyed to Escambia County subject to restrictions on use and reconveyance.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6329)
07/20/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-236.
05/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/27/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/26/2017-2:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/26/2017-2:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6329)
07/26/2017-2:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2370.
07/26/2017-2:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6328-6330)
07/26/2017-2:22pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/20/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 168.
07/20/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-236.
06/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/11/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/08/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/04/2017 Referred to
06/27/2017 Markup by
07/20/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-236
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands05/11/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/27/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2370. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/26/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Escambia County Land Conveyance Act

(Sec. 3) This bill authorizes Escambia County, Florida, to convey its interest in any part of the former Santa Rosa Island National Monument land that was conveyed to it by the federal government in 1947 to any person or entity, without restriction.

The bill prohibits any person or entity holding a leasehold interest in such land from being required to involuntarily accept a fee interest to such land in place of the leasehold interest.

The bill states that all interest of Escambia County in any part of such land that is within the jurisdictional boundaries of Santa Rosa County, Florida, shall be conveyed by Escambia County to such county within two years of the enactment of this bill.

Santa Rosa County or any other person to whom such county reconveys such land may reconvey any part of it.

Any proceeds from the conveyance of such land by either county (other than the amounts that are paid for the direct and incidental costs associated with the conveyance) shall be considered to be windfall profits that shall revert to the United States.

Escambia County must preserve in perpetuity those areas of the monument land conveyed under this bill that, as of this bill's enactment, are dedicated for conservation, preservation, public recreation access, and public parking.