There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

VETERAN Act
Veterans Equal Treatment Ensures Relief and Access Now Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

VETERAN Act
Veterans Equal Treatment Ensures Relief and Access Now Act

Short Titles as Introduced

VETERAN Act
Veterans Equal Treatment Ensures Relief and Access Now Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to clarify the rules relating to veteran health insurance and eligibility for the premium tax credit.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/15/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.(text: CR H4925)
06/02/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-159.
05/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
02/06/2018SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 301.
02/05/2018SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
06/15/2017SenateReceived in the Senate.
06/15/2017-1:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/15/2017-12:58pmHouseOn passage Passed by voice vote. (text: CR H4925)
06/15/2017-12:58pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/15/2017-12:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2372.
06/15/2017-12:29pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2372 and H.R. 2579, with 1 hour of general debate for each bill. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except a motion to recommit with or without instructions on each bill. Both measures will be considered read and are closed to amendments.
06/15/2017-12:29pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 379. (consideration: CR H4925-4929)
06/12/2017-7:16pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 379 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2372 and H.R. 2579. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2372 and H.R. 2579, with 1 hour of general debate for each bill. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except a motion to recommit with or without instructions on each bill. Both measures will be considered read and are closed to amendments.
06/02/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 106.
06/02/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-159.
05/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
05/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/18/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 05/18/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/18/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 05/18/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 05/18/2017
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/18/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/18/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 05/22/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/22/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/22/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/22/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/22/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/22/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 05/22/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/22/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/22/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/22/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/22/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/22/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 05/23/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/23/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 05/23/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/23/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/24/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 05/24/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/24/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/25/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 05/30/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/04/2017 Referred to
06/02/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-159

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2372. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/15/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 2, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans Equal Treatment Ensures Relief and Access Now Act or the VETERAN Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to specify that, for the purpose of determining eligibility for the premium assistance tax credit, an individual may not be treated as eligible for coverage under certain Department of Veterans Affairs health insurance programs unless the individual is enrolled in the program.

The bill applies to the premium assistance credit under current law for tax years ending after 2013 and, if the American Health Care Act of 2017 is enacted, the modified premium assistance credit that would take effect under that bill after 2019.

(Under current law, the premium assistance tax credit is a refundable tax credit provided to eligible individuals and families to subsidize the purchase of health insurance plans through an exchange established under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Individuals eligible for minimum essential health coverage from certain sources other than the individual insurance market are not eligible for the credit.)