Text: H.R.2372 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (02/06/2018)

Calendar No. 301

115th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 2372


To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to clarify the rules relating to veteran health insurance and eligibility for the premium tax credit.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

June 15, 2017

Received

February 5, 2018

Read the first time

February 6, 2018

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to clarify the rules relating to veteran health insurance and eligibility for the premium tax credit.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Veterans Equal Treatment Ensures Relief and Access Now Act” or the “VETERAN Act”.

SEC. 2. Clarification relating to veteran health insurance and eligibility for premium tax credit.

(a) Amendment of pre-2020 credit.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Section 36B(c)(2)(B)(i) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, prior to any amendment by section 214 of the American Health Care Act of 2017, is amended by adding at the end the following: “For purposes of the preceding sentence, an individual shall not be treated as eligible for coverage described in section 5000A(f)(1)(A)(v) unless such individual is enrolled in such coverage.”.

(2) EFFECTIVE DATE.—The amendment made by this subsection shall apply to taxable years ending after December 31, 2013.

(b) Amendment of post-2019 credit.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Section 36B(d) of such Code, as amended by section 214 of the American Health Care Act of 2017 and in effect for months beginning after December 31, 2019, is amended by adding at the end the following:

“For purposes of paragraph (2)(B), an individual shall not be treated as eligible for coverage described in section 5000A(f)(1)(A)(v) unless such individual is enrolled in such coverage.”.

(2) EFFECTIVE DATE.—The amendment made by this subsection is contingent upon the enactment of the American Health Care Act of 2017 and shall apply (if at all) to months beginning after December 31, 2019, in taxable years ending after such date.

Passed the House of Representatives June 15, 2017.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 301

115th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 2372

AN ACT
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to clarify the rules relating to veteran health insurance and eligibility for the premium tax credit.

February 6, 2018
Read the second time and placed on the calendar