There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Eastern Nevada Economic Development and Land Management Improvement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Eastern Nevada Economic Development and Land Management Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To facilitate certain pinyon-juniper related projects in Lincoln County, Nevada, to modify the boundaries of certain wilderness areas in the State of Nevada, and to fully implement the White Pine County Conservation, Recreation, and Development Act.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/14/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-311.
05/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
09/14/2017Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 221.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/14/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-311.
07/26/2017Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/26/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/11/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/04/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/04/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/04/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources05/04/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
09/14/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-311
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands05/11/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2374. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (09/14/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Eastern Nevada Economic Development and Land Management Improvement Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Lincoln County Land Act of 2000 (LCLA) to require implementation of a multispecies habitat conservation plan in Lincoln County, Nevada.

Both the LCLA and the Lincoln County Conservation, Recreation, and Development Act of 2004 (LCCRDA) are amended to make certain amounts available for comprehensive, cost-effective, and multijurisdictional hazardous fuels reduction projects and wildfire prevention planning activities (particularly for pinyon-juniper dominated landscapes) and other rangeland and woodland restoration projects within the county, consistent with the Ely Resource Management Plan or subsequent revisions or amendments to it.

The bill requires cooperative agreements between the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) and Lincoln County for certain county-provided law enforcement and planning-related activities approved by the Department of the Interior.

Certain portions of land sale proceeds returned to the County under the LCLA and the LCCRDA shall be used for economic development.

Under the LCCRDA Interior shall realign a specified portion of a 2,640-foot wide utility corridor.

The bill:

  • affirms and validates patent number 27-2005-0081 issued by the BLM on February 18, 2005, for the benefit of the desert tortoise, other species, and their habitats, to increase the likelihood of their recovery; and
  • ratifies the processes used by the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and the BLM in reconfiguring the land covered by the patent.

The BLM may issue a corrective patent for 7,548 specified acres of land in Lincoln County.

(Sec. 3) The bill amends the Pam White Wilderness Act to adjust the boundary of the Mt. Moriah Wilderness to include specified lands, and the boundary of the High Schells Wilderness to include and exclude specified lands.

The bill amends the Nevada Wilderness Protection Act of 1989 to adjust the boundary of the Arc Dome Wilderness to exclude specified land.

(Sec. 4) The bill amends the White Pine County Conservation, Recreation, and Development Act of 2006 to require the portions of the proceeds from certain BLM land sales in White Pine County that are:

  • paid to the county to also be used for municipal water and sewer infrastructure, public electric transmission facilities, and public broadband infrastructure; and
  • deposited into the White Pine County Special Account, to be used by Interior for processing public land use authorizations and rights-of-way relating to the development of the land conveyed to the county under such Act, with an emphasis on authorizations and rights-of-way relating to any infrastructure needed for the expansion of the White Pine County Industrial Park.

The bill further amends such Act to: (1) instruct, by December 31, 2018, the Departments of Agriculture and of the Interior, to convey certain lands to White Pine County, without consideration, in accordance with such Act, and if the conveyance has not been completed by such deadline, to immediately convey them to the county; and (2) allow the county, after the conveyance of those lands, to sell, lease, or convey the portion to be used for nonresidential development related to the expansion of Ely Airport and the industrial park, consistent with section 244 of the Nevada Revised Statutes effective as of this bill's enactment (currently, through a competitive bidding process).