There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nurse Staffing Standards for Hospital Patient Safety and Quality Care Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish direct care registered nurse-to-patient staffing ratio requirements in hospitals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
05/18/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/05/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/04/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/04/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/04/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/04/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/16/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/18/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/18/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/18/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/18/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/18/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/19/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/19/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/19/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/22/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/22/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/22/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/22/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/22/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/23/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/06/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 06/08/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/08/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/20/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/20/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/23/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/12/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/06/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/06/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/25/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/31/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/31/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 11/09/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/25/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 01/25/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/25/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/25/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/25/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/29/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/29/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/02/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/02/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/06/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/06/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/26/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/05/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/11/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 04/11/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/12/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/26/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/25/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/25/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 08/03/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/17/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 08/24/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/05/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/02/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/27/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/27/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/04/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/05/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/04/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/18/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2392. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/04/2017)

Nurse Staffing Standards for Patient Safety and Quality Care Act of 2017

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require hospitals to implement and submit to the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) a staffing plan that complies with specified minimum nurse-to-patient ratios by unit. Hospitals must post a notice regarding nurse-to-patient ratios in each unit and maintain records of actual ratios for each shift in each unit.

HHS must adjust Medicare payments to hospitals to cover additional costs incurred in providing services to Medicare beneficiaries that are attributable to compliance with these ratios.

The bill states that nurses have a duty and a right to act based on their professional judgment and provide care in the exclusive interests of patients. Nurses may object to, or refuse to participate in, an assignment if it would violate minimum ratios or if they are not prepared by education or experience to fulfill the assignment without compromising the safety of a patient or jeopardizing their nurse's license. Hospitals may not: (1) take specified actions against a nurse based on the nurse's refusal to accept an assignment for such a reason; or (2) discriminate against individuals for good faith complaints relating to the care, services, or conditions of the hospital or related facilities. HHS must publish the names of hospitals penalized for violating the requirements in this bill.

The bill adds stipends to the nurse workforce loan repayment and scholarship program. The nurse retention grant program is expanded to authorize programs to implement nurse preceptorship and mentorship projects.