There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Federal Reserve Transparency Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Reserve Transparency Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a full audit of the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Federal reserve banks by the Comptroller General of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/21/2017 Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-318.
01/03/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
09/21/2017 Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 228.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/21/2017 Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-318.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/28/2017 Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/28/2017 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
01/03/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (114)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/03/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 01/03/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/06/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/06/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/06/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/06/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/06/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/06/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/06/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/06/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/06/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 01/06/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 01/06/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/06/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 01/06/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/06/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 01/13/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 01/13/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/13/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/13/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/13/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 01/13/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 01/13/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/13/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 01/13/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/13/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/24/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/24/2017
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/24/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/24/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 01/24/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 01/24/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/03/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/03/2017
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 02/03/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 02/03/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 02/03/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/03/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/03/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/16/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/16/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/16/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 02/16/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 02/16/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/28/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/28/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/28/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/06/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 03/06/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 03/09/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 03/16/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 03/24/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/27/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/27/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 03/27/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/27/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 03/27/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/28/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 03/28/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/28/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/28/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/28/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 03/29/2017
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/29/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/29/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/03/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/04/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 05/04/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/23/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/20/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 09/21/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/21/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/03/2017 Referred to
03/28/2017 Markup by
09/21/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-318

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Accounting and auditing
  • Bank accounts, deposits, capital
  • Congressional oversight
  • Federal Reserve System
  • Government studies and investigations

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.24. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

Federal Reserve Transparency Act of 2017

This bill directs the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to complete, within 12 months, an audit of the Federal Reserve Board and Federal Reserve banks.

In addition, the bill allows the GAO to audit the Federal Reserve Board and Federal Reserve banks with respect to: (1) international financial transactions; (2) deliberations, decisions, or actions on monetary policy matters; (3) transactions made under the direction of the Federal Open Market Committee; and (4) discussions or communications among Federal Reserve officers, board members, and employees regarding any of these matters.