There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Accurate Workplace Injury and Illness Records Restoration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 to clarify when the time period for the issuance of citations under such Act begins and to require a rule to clarify that an employer's duty to make and maintain accurate records of work-related injuries and illnesses is an ongoing obligation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/16/2017Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/16/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 05/16/2017
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/16/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/17/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/17/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/17/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/18/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/18/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/19/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/22/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/25/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/25/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/06/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/06/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/08/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/12/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/26/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/11/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/11/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/14/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/05/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/01/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce05/16/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2428. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/16/2017)

Accurate Workplace Injury and Illness Records Restoration Act

This bill amends the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 to specify that the Occupational Safety and Health Administration (OSHA) may issue a citation for a violation of workplace safety requirements within the six-month period following an employer satisfying the requirements. Current law includes a limitation period that prevents OSHA from issuing citations six months after the occurrence of a violation. Thus, this bill specifies that the statute of limitations is tolled if there is a continuing violation of the requirements.

OSHA must issue a rule that amends its record keeping regulations to clarify that the duty to make and maintain accurate records of work-related injuries and illnesses: (1) is an ongoing obligation, (2) continues for as long as the employer is required to keep records of the recordable injury or illness, and (3) does not expire solely because the employer fails to create the necessary records when first required to do so.