There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Homeland Security Assessment of Terrorists Use of Virtual Currencies Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Homeland Security Assessment of Terrorists Use of Virtual Currencies Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Under Secretary of Homeland Security for Intelligence and Analysis to develop and disseminate a threat assessment regarding terrorist use of virtual currency.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7242)
05/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
09/13/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/12/2017-12:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2017-12:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7242)
09/12/2017-12:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2433.
09/12/2017-12:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7242-7243)
09/12/2017-12:52pmHouseMr. Perry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/18/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/18/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence
05/17/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
05/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/22/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security05/16/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence05/17/2017 Referred to
05/18/2017 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/13/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2433.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2433. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/12/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Homeland Security Assessment of Terrorists Use of Virtual Currencies Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security's Office of Intelligence and Analysis: (1) in coordination with appropriate federal partners, to develop and disseminate a threat assessment regarding the threat posed by individuals using virtual currency to carry out activities in furtherance of an act of terrorism, including the provision of material support or resources to a foreign terrorist organization; and (2) to share such assessment with state, local, and tribal law enforcement officials.