There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Organic Agriculture Research Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Food, Agriculture, Conservation, and Trade Act of 1990 to reauthorize the organic agriculture research and extension initiative.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/16/2017Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/16/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/26/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/26/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/26/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/26/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/26/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/26/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/26/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/26/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/26/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/26/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/26/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/26/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/26/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/26/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/26/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/26/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/26/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/26/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 09/26/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/26/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/26/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/27/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/27/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/27/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/27/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/04/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/04/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/04/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/04/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/04/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/04/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 10/05/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/05/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 10/05/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/05/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/05/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/05/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/24/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 10/24/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 10/24/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/24/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 10/24/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/24/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/24/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/24/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/24/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/24/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/25/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/07/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/07/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/14/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 12/06/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/13/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 01/30/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/30/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/09/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 11/02/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/16/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research06/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2436. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/16/2017)

Organic Agriculture Research Act of 2017

This bill amends the Food, Agriculture, Conservation, and Trade Act of 1990 to increase and make permanent mandatory funding for the organic agriculture research and extension initiative and extend discretionary funding for such initiative through FY2023.